USA v. Colding et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00054 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
94
05/24/2018
Unopposed Motion
95
05/24/2018
Declaration
05/25/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
97
05/25/2018
Notice (Other)
98
06/11/2018
Continue
06/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
100
07/02/2018
Unopposed Motion
101
07/02/2018
Declaration
07/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
103
07/27/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
104
07/27/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
105
07/30/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
106
07/30/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
107
07/31/2018
Unopposed Motion
08/01/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
109
08/01/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
110
08/01/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
111
08/06/2018
DEPS Notice
112
08/08/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
113
08/08/2018
Sentencing
116
08/20/2018
Judgment
117
08/20/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
08/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/10/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
122
09/26/2018
Hearing
10/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.