USA v. Cole et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2014-cr-00057 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
05/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
443
05/22/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
446
07/17/2018
Certificate of Service
447
07/20/2018
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
451
09/28/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
452
10/01/2018
Continue
10/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.