USA v. Collier
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00153-61078 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/11/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
12/11/2018
Indictment - For Public
12/14/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
12/16/2018
Pretrial Services Report
12/17/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/17/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
12/17/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
7
12/17/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
8
12/17/2018
Order of Detention
9
12/19/2018
Third Party Custodian Report
10
12/21/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
11
12/26/2018
Detention Hearing
12
12/26/2018
Order of Detention
13
01/08/2019
Order
01/14/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/14/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
01/30/2019
Plea Agreement
17
01/30/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
02/06/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/06/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/06/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/06/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
02/07/2019
Forfeiture of Property
21
02/08/2019
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
22
03/20/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
23
04/09/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
24
04/09/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
04/10/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
04/18/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
27
04/18/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
28
04/18/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
29
04/18/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
30
04/19/2019
Seal Document
32
04/22/2019
Order on Motion to Seal Document
33
04/22/2019
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
34
04/24/2019
Seal Document
36
04/24/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
37
04/24/2019
Declaration
04/24/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
04/24/2019
Order - Sealed pdf
40
04/25/2019
Notice (Other)
04/25/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
05/07/2019
Forfeiture of Property
44
05/07/2019
Affidavit
45
05/17/2019
Judgment
46
05/17/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.