USA v. Collins
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00085 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
43
06/19/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
07/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
07/06/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
07/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
08/07/2018
Information - ALL Misdemeanor
48
08/07/2018
Plea Agreement
49
08/07/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
08/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
08/13/2018
Notice (Other)
53
08/29/2018
Vacate
54
08/29/2018
Declaration
08/30/2018
Order on Motion to Vacate (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
10/09/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.