USA v. Coppock
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00022-59263 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
05/22/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
05/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/22/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/24/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/24/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
06/15/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
25
06/21/2018
Withdraw as Attorney
26
06/22/2018
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
27
07/31/2018
Continue
07/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
09/14/2018
Amended Pretrial Services Report
09/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
09/20/2018
Continue
09/20/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
09/20/2018
Continue
09/21/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
10/08/2018
Suppress
10/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
10/10/2018
Response in Opposition
40
10/11/2018
Response in Opposition
41
10/23/2018
Order on Motion to Suppress
42
10/24/2018
Suppress
43
10/30/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
44
10/31/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
11/01/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
11/13/2018
Response in Opposition
49
11/29/2018
Hearing
51
12/12/2018
Order on Motion to Suppress
12/14/2018
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
53
12/17/2018
Pretrial Services Report
12/18/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
01/09/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
56
01/22/2019
Hearing
01/22/2019
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
01/24/2019
Order Setting Conditions of Release
65
01/24/2019
Order of Release
02/07/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/07/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/07/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/12/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/12/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/12/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
68
02/26/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
02/27/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
71
03/13/2019
Plea Agreement
72
03/13/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
03/13/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/13/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
74
03/13/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
03/21/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
77
05/07/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
05/17/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/17/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.