USA v. Cotten Jr. et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2017-cr-00015 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
65
08/17/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
66
08/30/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
71
09/19/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
72
09/26/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
73
09/26/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
74
09/28/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
75
09/28/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
09/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
81
10/17/2018
Judgment
82
10/17/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.