USA v. Covich
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00116-56328 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
94
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
95
03/20/2019
Unopposed Motion
03/21/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
97
03/21/2019
Response in Opposition
98
03/22/2019
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
99
03/25/2019
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
03/25/2019
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
100
03/27/2019
Notice (Other)
101
03/28/2019
Quash
03/28/2019
Order on Motion to Quash (Text entry; no document attached.)
103
04/24/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.