USA v. Cox et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2011-cr-00022 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
691
06/14/2018
Notice (Other)
692
06/18/2018
Order
693
06/27/2018
Status Report
694
07/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
695
07/25/2018
Returned/Undeliverable Mail
696
08/22/2018
Order
697
08/22/2018
USPO Expiration of Supervision - 34
698
08/23/2018
Order
701
09/05/2018
Notice (Other)
702
10/10/2018
Stipulation
703
10/10/2018
Order
704
11/29/2018
Writ
705
12/03/2018
Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.