USA v. Cox et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2011-cr-00022-41220 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
691
06/14/2018
Notice (Other)
692
06/18/2018
Order
693
06/27/2018
Status Report
694
07/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
695
07/25/2018
Returned/Undeliverable Mail
696
08/22/2018
Order
697
08/22/2018
USPO Expiration of Supervision - 34
698
08/23/2018
Order
701
09/05/2018
Notice (Other)
702
10/10/2018
Stipulation
703
10/10/2018
Order
704
11/29/2018
Writ
705
12/03/2018
Order
706
12/12/2018
Continue
707
12/13/2018
Order on Motion to Continue
708
01/03/2019
Continue
709
01/03/2019
Order on Motion to Continue
710
01/09/2019
Seal Document
712
01/09/2019
Discovery
713
01/10/2019
Order on Motion to Seal Document
714
01/16/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
715
01/16/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
716
01/16/2019
Response in Opposition
717
01/18/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
718
01/18/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
719
01/23/2019
Response in Opposition
720
02/05/2019
Order on Motion for Discovery
721
02/14/2019
Reply to Response
722
02/22/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
723
02/26/2019
Order on Motion for Writ
724
03/18/2019
Continue
725
03/19/2019
Order on Motion to Continue
728
04/25/2019
Protective Order
729
04/26/2019
Order on Motion for Protective Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.