USA v. Cruz Perez
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00126 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
40
06/26/2018
Notice of Change of Address
41
07/13/2018
Status Report
07/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
08/13/2018
Status Report
08/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
09/05/2018
Plea Agreement
48
09/05/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
09/26/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
10/03/2018
Forfeiture of Property
52
10/03/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
53
10/14/2018
Continue
54
10/14/2018
Affidavit
55
10/15/2018
Order on Motion to Continue

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.