USA v. Curtin
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00020-59258 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
14
05/22/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
15
05/22/2018
Continue
05/23/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/30/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/30/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/30/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
06/28/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
07/02/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
07/13/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
07/16/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
07/17/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
07/17/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/17/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/23/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
08/14/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
08/16/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
10/22/2018
Continue
10/22/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
01/04/2019
Plea Agreement
42
01/04/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
43
01/07/2019
Information - Felony
01/07/2019
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
01/07/2019
Waiver of Indictment
47
01/08/2019
Errata
48
02/28/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
49
03/20/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
50
03/28/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
51
03/28/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
52
03/29/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
04/02/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/02/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
04/04/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
56
04/04/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
04/09/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
60
04/18/2019
Judgment
61
04/18/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.