USA v. Dadia et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2017-cr-00017 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
91
06/18/2018
Stipulation
92
06/19/2018
Order on Stipulation
93
08/16/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
94
08/16/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
95
08/31/2018
Unopposed Motion
08/31/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
98
09/05/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
102
09/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
103
09/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
104
09/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
105
09/13/2018
Notice (Other)
106
09/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
107
09/14/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
108
09/14/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
109
09/14/2018
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
110
09/14/2018
Notice (Other)
111
09/14/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
112
09/14/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
113
09/19/2018
Notice (Other)
09/20/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
119
10/05/2018
Judgment
120
10/05/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
121
10/05/2018
Judgment
122
10/05/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
10/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
124
11/01/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
125
11/08/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
126
11/08/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
127
11/08/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
128
11/08/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
11/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.