USA v. Dadia
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2013-cr-00001-48658 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
64
08/31/2018
Violation Disposition Report
65
09/10/2018
Unopposed Motion
09/11/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
71
01/03/2019
Judgment on Revocation
72
01/03/2019
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.