USA v. Daley et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2014-cr-00035 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
172
05/18/2018
Violation Disposition Report
05/29/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
174
06/12/2018
Judgment on Revocation
175
06/12/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf
08/09/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
177
08/13/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
08/14/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
179
08/14/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
180
08/14/2018
Order of Detention
181
08/17/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
08/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
184
09/04/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
186
10/11/2018
Violation Disposition Report
10/19/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
189
11/08/2018
Judgment on Revocation
190
11/08/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.