USA v. Daley et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2014-cr-00035-50366 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
195
02/15/2019
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
196
02/15/2019
Order of Detention
02/15/2019
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/15/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
197
02/19/2019
Warrant Returned Executed
03/15/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/28/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/28/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/25/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/25/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/17/2019
Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/17/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.