USA v. Dalton
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00059 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
64
05/31/2018
Forfeiture of Property
65
05/31/2018
Affidavit
66
06/11/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
67
06/11/2018
Forfeiture of Property
68
06/11/2018
Affidavit
69
06/15/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
70
09/13/2018
Vacate (2255)
71
09/13/2018
Memorandum
72
10/09/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
73
10/26/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
74
11/09/2018
Appoint Counsel
75
11/09/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.