USA v. Davis
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00131-60912 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
9
10/18/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
10
10/18/2018
Indictment - For Public
10/18/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/19/2018
Notice (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
10/19/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
13
10/21/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
14
10/22/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
10/23/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
10/23/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
17
10/23/2018
Order of Detention
11/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
11/13/2018
Continue
21
11/13/2018
Affidavit
11/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
12/02/2018
Status Report
26
01/29/2019
Order
01/31/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/06/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
05/01/2019
Order
37
05/01/2019
Psychiatric Report
38
05/06/2019
Status Report
05/09/2019
Notice (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/09/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/09/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/14/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/14/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/17/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/17/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/17/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.