USA v. Davison
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2017-cr-00009 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
20
06/06/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
21
06/28/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
22
06/28/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
23
06/29/2018
Unopposed Motion
24
06/29/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
07/02/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
07/02/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
27
07/02/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
28
07/05/2018
Order
07/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
07/05/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
31
07/05/2018
Errata
33
07/05/2018
Supplement
34
07/09/2018
Sentencing
36
08/10/2018
Judgment
37
08/10/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.