USA v. Dela Rosa
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00153 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
22
05/25/2018
Notice (Other)
05/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
05/26/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
05/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
06/01/2018
Plea Agreement
26
06/01/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
06/06/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
06/26/2018
Notice of Change of Address
33
08/07/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
34
08/27/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
35
09/03/2018
Continue
36
09/03/2018
Affidavit
10/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
10/31/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
40
10/31/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
41
10/31/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
42
10/31/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
11/07/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
11/21/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
12/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.