USA v. Dela Rosa
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00153-58693 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
22
05/25/2018
Notice (Other)
05/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
05/26/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
05/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
06/01/2018
Plea Agreement
26
06/01/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
06/06/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
06/26/2018
Notice of Change of Address
33
08/07/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
34
08/27/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
35
09/03/2018
Continue
36
09/03/2018
Affidavit
10/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
10/31/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
40
10/31/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
41
10/31/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
42
10/31/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
11/07/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
11/21/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
12/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
12/28/2018
Supplement
48
12/28/2018
Supplement
49
12/28/2018
Continue
50
12/28/2018
Affidavit
12/31/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
01/13/2019
Continue
53
01/13/2019
Affidavit
01/14/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
02/20/2019
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
56
02/23/2019
Continue
57
02/23/2019
Affidavit
02/26/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
04/24/2019
Continue
04/24/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.