USA v. Delpriore
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00136-60998 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
3
12/12/2018
Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received
12/17/2018
Notice of Arrest - Other District (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/15/2019
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/15/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/15/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
02/18/2019
Pretrial Services Report
02/19/2019
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
02/19/2019
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
9
02/19/2019
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
10
02/19/2019
Order of Detention
12
02/21/2019
Warrant Returned Executed
02/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/25/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/25/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
03/01/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
15
03/19/2019
Continue
16
03/19/2019
Continue
03/20/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/20/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/20/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/04/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/04/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/04/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
05/24/2019
Continue
22
05/24/2019
Unopposed Motion

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.