USA v. Demmert et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2017-cr-00008 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
50
05/22/2018
Plea Agreement
51
05/22/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
52
05/22/2018
Plea Agreement
53
05/22/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
06/01/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/01/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
58
06/13/2018
Errata
07/06/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
60
07/23/2018
Status Report
61
08/30/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
62
08/30/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
63
09/13/2018
Objection to Report and Recommendations
09/18/2018
Docket Annotation re Wrong Event Selected (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
Docket Annotation re Wrong Event Selected (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
09/18/2018
Objection to Presentence Investigation Report
65
09/19/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
66
09/19/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
67
09/27/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
09/28/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
71
10/01/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
72
10/01/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
73
10/01/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
74
10/01/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
75
10/04/2018
Supplement
76
10/11/2018
Supplement
10/11/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
81
10/22/2018
Judgment
82
10/22/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
83
10/22/2018
Judgment
84
10/22/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
85
10/26/2018
Amended Judgment
86
10/26/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
87
10/26/2018
Amended Judgment
88
10/26/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.