USA v. Demure
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00064-60180 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
19
06/15/2018
Waiver of Indictment
06/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/26/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/26/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
06/15/2018
Information - Felony
24
06/26/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
25
07/24/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
26
07/24/2018
Continue
07/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/25/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
08/24/2018
Additional Related Document
32
10/06/2018
Appear
10/08/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
11/09/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
11/09/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
11/25/2018
Continue
11/26/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
01/23/2019
Appear
01/24/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
02/22/2019
Order
46
02/25/2019
Status Report
02/28/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/13/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/13/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
03/13/2019
Appear
50
03/13/2019
Continue
03/13/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/13/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/13/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
04/18/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
56
04/25/2019
Amend/Correct
57
04/25/2019
Status Report
58
04/25/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
04/26/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/26/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/26/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
60
04/26/2019
Notice (Other)
61
04/26/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
62
04/26/2019
Response in Opposition
04/29/2019
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
04/30/2019
Appear
65
04/30/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
66
04/30/2019
Declaration
04/30/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/30/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
Receipt for Funds (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/06/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/06/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
70
05/06/2019
Status Report
71
05/14/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
72
05/16/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
73
05/16/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
74
05/16/2019
Declaration
05/16/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
76
05/18/2019
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.