USA v. Demure
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-mj-00313 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/24/2018
Complaint
4
05/24/2018
Unseal Document
5
05/24/2018
Order on Motion to Unseal Document
05/24/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
05/25/2018
Pretrial Services Report
05/25/2018
Initial Appearance (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/25/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
05/25/2018
Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing
11
05/25/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
12
05/25/2018
Order of Release
05/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
05/30/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
05/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
06/05/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
17
06/08/2018
Appearance Bond
18
06/08/2018
Passport Surrendered
19
06/15/2018
Waiver of Indictment
06/15/2018
Docket Annotation - Indictment Filed (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.