USA v. Dennis et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cr-00013-61093 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
18
01/11/2019
Warrant Returned Executed
01/14/2019
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/14/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
01/15/2019
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
22
01/15/2019
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
25
01/15/2019
Order of Detention
27
01/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
02/08/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/08/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/14/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/14/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/20/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/26/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/26/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/04/2019
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
04/22/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
48
04/22/2019
Plea Agreement
49
04/22/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
04/24/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/24/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/24/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/14/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/14/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/14/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/14/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
05/14/2019
Notice (Other)
60
05/14/2019
Report and Recommendation (Final with No Initial R&R)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.