USA v. Dennis et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cr-00013-61094 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
7
12/19/2018
Unseal Document
12/19/2018
Order on Motion to Unseal Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
Order on Motion to Unseal Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
Notice of Arrest - Other District (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
12/26/2018
Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received
14
01/07/2019
Pretrial Services Report
15
01/08/2019
Pretrial Services Report
16
01/09/2019
Appear
01/09/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/14/2019
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/14/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
01/15/2019
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
24
01/15/2019
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
26
01/15/2019
Order Setting Conditions of Release
27
01/25/2019
Order
28
02/01/2019
Passport Surrendered
29
02/07/2019
Unopposed Motion
30
02/07/2019
Unopposed Motion
02/08/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/08/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/08/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/14/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/14/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/20/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
02/20/2019
Unopposed Motion
02/21/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/26/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/26/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/26/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/26/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/04/2019
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
42
03/20/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
03/27/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/27/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/18/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/18/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/18/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/18/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/18/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/24/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/24/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/24/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/24/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
05/08/2019
Notice (Other)
56
05/10/2019
Report and Recommendation (Final with No Initial R&R)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.