USA v. Derryberry
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2012-cr-00009-47610 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
61
03/04/2019
Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
62
03/06/2019
Order on Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
03/06/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/06/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
03/13/2019
Summons Returned Executed
03/22/2019
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/22/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/22/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
66
03/22/2019
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
67
03/22/2019
Notice (Other)
68
03/22/2019
Order Setting Conditions of Release
69
04/01/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
04/22/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/02/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/13/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.