USA v. Devoe
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00098 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
28
08/02/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
09/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
11/06/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
35
11/06/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
36
11/07/2018
Unopposed Motion
11/08/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
11/08/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
39
11/08/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
40
11/13/2018
Notice (Other)
41
11/14/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
11/16/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
11/19/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
45
11/20/2018
Judgment
46
11/20/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.