USA v. Diard, et al - Jason Charles Diard
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of Alabama

1:2017-cr-00045 (alsd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 420 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/23/2017
INDICTMENT as to Cameron Alexander Michanowicz (1) count(s) 1, Jeffery Mason Baisch (2) count(s) 1, 9, Jason Charles Diard (3) count(s) 1, 8, Donald Ray Thomas, Jr (4) count(s) 1, 2-3, 5, 6, Klifton Adam Bond (5) count(s) 1, 4, 7, Jessica Michelle Polk (6) count(s) 1. FORFEITURE ALLEGATIONS
2
signed indictment) (srr
2 Attachments
2
02/23/2017
MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Cameron Alexander Michanowicz, Jeffery Mason Baisch, Jason Charles Diard, Donald Ray Thomas, Jr, Klifton Adam Bond, Jessica Michelle Polk. Referred to Judge William E. Cassady.
3
02/23/2017
ORDER granting 2 Motion to Seal Case as to Cameron Alexander Michanowicz (1), Jeffery Mason Baisch (2), Jason Charles Diard (3), Donald Ray Thomas Jr. (4), Klifton Adam Bond (5), Jessica Michelle Polk (6). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 2/23/2017.
11
03/06/2017
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA as to Jason Charles Diard.
14
03/06/2017
ORDER granting 11 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Jason Charles Diard. Arraignment set for 3/8/2017 02:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3A, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/6/2017.
18
03/08/2017
Warrant Returned Executed on 03/08/2017 as to Jason Charles Diard.
03/08/2017
Case unsealed as to Jason Charles Diard, Klifton Adam Bond (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
03/08/2017
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jason Charles Diard
21
03/08/2017
CJA 20 as to Jason Charles Diard: Appointment of Attorney Gordon G. Armstrong, III for Jason Charles Diard. The link below is the CJA-19 Notice to Court-Appointed Counsel of Public Disclosure of Attorney Fee Information.
CJA 19 Notice of Public Disclosure . Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/8/2017.
22
03/08/2017
Order on Initial Appearance as to Jason Charles Diard. Defendant informed of rights. AUSA Sinan Kalayoglu for AUSA Gloria Bedwell appeared for the Government. Court-appointed counsel Gordon Armstrong appeared for the Defendant. Defendant ordered detained pending trial unless circumstances change. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/8/2017.
23
03/08/2017
Order on Arraignment as to Jason Charles Diard (3) Count 1,8. Jury Selection set for 5/1/2017 08:45AM. Pretrial Motions due by 4/7/2017. Probation Officers Report due 3/15/2017. Certification of Guideline Calculations due 4/7/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2017 10:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3A, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/8/2017. Emailed to AUSA, USM, Prob, Deft's counsel
03/08/2017
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Initial Appearance and Arraignment as to Jason Charles Diard (3) Count 1,8 held on 3/8/2017 (Digital Court Recording) (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
03/13/2017
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Jason Charles Diard. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/8/2017. Emailed to AUSA, USM, Prob, Deft's counsel
69
04/06/2017
MOTION Request to Attend Pretrial Conference by Jason Charles Diard.
04/06/2017
REFERRAL OF 69 MOTION Request to Attend Pretrial Conference as to Jason Charles Diard to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (Text entry; no document attached.)
70
04/06/2017
ENDORSED ORDER granting 69 Motion as to Jason Charles Diard (3). The U. S. Marshal is directed to produce the Defendant for the pretrial conference on April 11, 2017, at 10:00 AM Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/6/2017. Emailed to AUSA, USM, Prob, Deft's counsel
71
04/10/2017
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jason Charles Diard, Klifton Adam Bond (CHANGE IN MAGISTRATE JUDGE) Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2017 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3A, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray.
04/11/2017
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: Pretrial Conference as to Cameron Alexander Michanowicz, Jason Charles Diard, Klifton Adam Bond, Jessica Michelle Polk held on 4/11/2017. (Digital Court Recording) (Text entry; no document attached.)
75
04/11/2017
ORDER as to Cameron Alexander Michanowicz, Jason Charles Diard, Klifton Adam Bond, Jessica Michelle Polk, (Supplemental Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2017 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose.) The U. S. Marshal is directed to produce the Defendants for the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/11/2017. Emailed to AUSA, USM, Prob, Deft's counsel
76
04/11/2017
ORDER as to Cameron Alexander Michanowicz, Jason Charles Diard, Klifton Adam Bond, Jessica Michelle Polk re 75 Order, (CORRECTION OF PRESIDING JUDGE) (Supplemental Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2017 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3A, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray.). Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/11/2017. Emailed to AUSA, USM, Prob, Deft's counsel
04/20/2017
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: Pretrial Conference as to Jason Charles Diard, Klifton Adam Bond, Jessica Michelle Polk held on 4/20/2017 (Digital Court Recording) (Text entry; no document attached.)
83
04/20/2017
MOTION to Continue in Interest of Justice by USA as to Jason Charles Diard, Klifton Adam Bond.
04/21/2017
REFERRAL OF 83 MOTION to Continue in Interest of Justice as to Jason Charles Diard, Klifton Adam Bond to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (Text entry; no document attached.)
85
04/21/2017
Order on Pretrial Conference as to Jason Charles Diard. It is ORDERED that this case be scheduled for trial during the May, 2017 criminal term, with jury selection commencing on May 1, 2017. The parties estimate the trial to consume two and a half days. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/21/2017. (mcb)
Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
86
04/21/2017
ORDER granting 83 Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice as to Jason Charles Diard and Klifton Adam Bond. This case is hereby CONTINUED to the July 2017 criminal term. The pretrial conference and jury selection will be reset before the appropriate Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/21/2017.
88
04/25/2017
WAIVER of Speedy Trial by Jason Charles Diard
107
05/08/2017
ORDER as to Jason Charles Diard, Klifton Adam Bond re 86 Order on Motion to Continue (Pretrial Conference set for 6/13/2017 at 9:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1A before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 5/8/2017. Copies to counsel,USPO,USMS
116
06/05/2017
MOTION to Compel Production of Discovery, or in the alternative, Motion to Exclude by Jason Charles Diard. Modified on 6/13/2017
117
06/05/2017
ORDER as to Jeffery Mason Baisch, Jason Charles Diard, Donald Ray Thomas, Jr, Klifton Adam Bond stating should the dft choose to request a change-of-plea hearing, a consent form must be executed. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/5/2017.
1
Consent Form) (mpp
1 Attachment
119
06/05/2017
ORDER as to Jason Charles Diard re: 116 MOTION to Compel Production of Discovery, or in the alternative, Motion to Exclude filed by Jason Charles Diard. Government is directed to file a response to the motion by June 9, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 6/5/2017.
127
06/07/2017
MOTION Request to Attend Pretrial Conference by Jason Charles Diard. Modified on 6/8/2017
06/08/2017
REFERRAL OF 127 MOTION Request to Attend Pretrial Conference as to Jason Charles Diard to Judge Sonja F. Bivins (Text entry; no document attached.)
130
06/08/2017
RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Jason Charles Diard re 116 MOTION to Compel Production of Discovery, or in the alternative, Motion to Exclude
131
06/09/2017
ENDORSED ORDER granting [Doc. 127] Motion to Attend Pretrial Conference as to Jason Charles Diard (3). USMS are ORDERED to PRODUCE the Defendant for the Pretrial Conference set for 6/13/17 at 9:30 AM Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 6/9/2017.
06/12/2017
REFERRAL OF 130 Response in Opposition by USA re; MOTION to Compel Production of Discovery, or in the alternative, Motion to Exclude as to Jason Charles Diard to Judge Sonja F. Bivins (Text entry; no document attached.)
132
06/13/2017
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins:Pretrial Conference as to Jason Charles Diard, Klifton Adam Bond held on 6/14/2017 - Dfts. to be set for trial in Aug - 6/26/17 Jy Sel - Order to follow. DCR Digital Audio Recording.
06/14/2017
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins:Telephone Conference as to Jason Charles Diard, Klifton Adam Bond held on 6/14/2017 DCR Digital Audio Recording. (Text entry; no document attached.)
140
06/21/2017
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Telephone Conference as to Jason Charles Diard & Klifton Adam Bond held on 6/21/2017 (Telephone Conference set for 6/23/2017 at 11:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1A before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins.) Copies to counsel - email to follow re: call-in information.
06/23/2017
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins:Telephone Conference as to Jason Charles Diard & Klifton Adam Bond held on 6/23/2017. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (Text entry; no document attached.)
144
06/26/2017
ORDER granting 142 Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice as to Klifton Adam Bond and Jason Charles Diard. This case is hereby CONTINUED to the August 2017 criminal term, with jury selection on July 31, 2017. Counsel for Defendant Diard shall file, on or before June 29, 2017, a Speedy Trial Waiver executed by Defendant and his counsel. Counsel for Defendant Diard shall also notify the Court by June 29, 2017, if he will be proceeding to trial. Referred to Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray for setting a pretrial conference in July, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 6/26/2017.
145
07/05/2017
Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty to Count One as to Jason Charles Diard Modified docket text on 7/5/2017
146
07/05/2017
ORDER as to Jason Charles Diard re 145 Notice of Intent to Plead Guilty (Change of Plea Hearing set for 7/7/2017 at 8:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose.) USMS are ORDERED to PRODUCE the dft. for this hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/5/2017. Copies to counsel,USPO,USMS,CRD [attys contacted by phone]
147
07/06/2017
PLEA AGREEMENT as to Jason Charles Diard with Factual Resume Modified on 7/7/2017
151
07/07/2017
Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry entered as to Jason Charles Diard. Guilty as to Count 1, charging the offense of 21:846 Conspiracy to possess with intent to distribute methamphetamine. Defense Counsel Gordon Armstrong, III. Government Counsel Gloria Bedwell. Defendant's guilty plea was accepted 7/7/2017 and Defendant was found guilty as charged. The plea agreement was written. The maximum penalties are 10 yrs to Life/$10,000,000/5 yrs SRT/$100 SA. Pending sentencing Defendant shall remain in custody. Court Reporter Melanie Wilkins. This is a text only order. Sentencing set for 12/8/2017 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose. Presentence Investigation Report due 11/3/2017. On or before 11/24/2017 the parties shall each file a Position with Respect to Sentencing Factors in accordance with Criminal Local Rule 32(B)(4). In the event that the parties chose to file a Sentencing Memorandum, it shall be due seven (7) days prior to the date of sentencing. In the event that the parties decide to file a Motion to Continue Sentencing based upon defendant's incomplete cooperation with the Government, the motion shall be due four (4) days prior to the date of sentencing. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/7/2017.
158
07/18/2017
ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot [Doc. 116] Motion to Compel as to Jason Charles Diard (3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 7/18/2017.
193
08/14/2017
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jason Charles Diard: Sentencing RESCHEDULED for 12/15/2017 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose. The USM is directed to produce the defendant for this hearing.
206
09/25/2017
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 196 Draft Presentence Investigation Report as to Jessica Michelle Polk. Modified on 9/26/2017 (mcb). Modified on 9/26/2017
255
05/21/2018
Postpone Sentencing
05/22/2018
Order on Motion to Postpone Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
257
05/23/2018
Postpone Sentencing
05/23/2018
Order on Motion to Postpone Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
259
05/24/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
05/24/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/24/2018
Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
261
06/06/2018
Sealed Document, Motion for Leave to File
06/06/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Seal Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/06/2018
Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
264
06/14/2018
Postpone Sentencing
265
06/14/2018
Postpone Sentencing
266
06/14/2018
Postpone Sentencing
06/14/2018
Order on Motion to Postpone Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/14/2018
Order on Motion to Postpone Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/14/2018
Order on Motion to Postpone Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
278
09/13/2018
Postpone Sentencing
09/13/2018
Order on Motion to Postpone Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
280
09/14/2018
Postpone Sentencing
281
09/14/2018
Postpone Sentencing
09/14/2018
Order on Motion to Postpone Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
283
09/14/2018
Postpone Sentencing
284
09/14/2018
Postpone Sentencing
09/14/2018
Order on Motion to Postpone Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
Order on Motion to Postpone Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
Order on Motion to Postpone Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.