USA v. Diaz-Lara et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00152 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
39
08/03/2018
Unopposed Motion
08/03/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/13/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
08/17/2018
Unopposed Motion
08/20/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
09/19/2018
Notice (Other)
46
10/04/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
47
10/11/2018
Unopposed Motion
10/15/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.