USA v. Dimmer et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2012-cr-00035-47823 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
230
10/01/2018
Vacate (2255)
231
10/01/2018
Memorandum
232
10/16/2018
Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)
233
11/05/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
234
11/07/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
235
11/09/2018
Certificate of Appealability
236
11/15/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
237
12/13/2018
Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
238
12/17/2018
USCA Case Number
239
04/02/2019
USCA Order
240
05/09/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
241
05/09/2019
Memorandum

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.