USA v. Dixon et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2013-cr-00042 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
700
07/05/2018
Response in Opposition
701
07/05/2018
Leave to File Document
07/09/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
702
07/10/2018
Leave to File Document
703
07/16/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
07/30/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
705
08/12/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
706
08/20/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
08/20/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/20/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
709
08/23/2018
Notice (Other)
710
08/23/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
711
08/23/2018
Order of Detention
712
08/28/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
713
08/31/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
714
09/05/2018
Continue
715
09/05/2018
Affidavit
09/28/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
719
10/16/2018
Violation Disposition Report
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.