USA v. Dollison et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2009-cr-00107 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
641
06/11/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
642
06/11/2018
Order of Detention
06/11/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
644
06/13/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
645
06/13/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
06/14/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/14/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
647
06/14/2018
Order of Detention
07/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/17/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
654
07/31/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
655
08/02/2018
Continue
656
08/03/2018
Order on Motion to Continue
08/30/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
660
09/28/2018
Notice (Other)
661
10/01/2018
Continue
10/02/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.