USA v. Dollison
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2009-cr-00106-18914 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
121
06/04/2018
Supplement
122
06/08/2018
Continue
123
06/08/2018
Order on Motion to Continue
124
08/30/2018
Notice (Other)
09/24/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
126
02/26/2019
Report and Recommendation - Initial (Final R&R to follow)
127
03/12/2019
Objection to Report and Recommendations
128
03/12/2019
Objection to Report and Recommendations
129
03/19/2019
Reply to Objection to Report and Recommendation
130
03/19/2019
Errata
131
03/19/2019
Reply to Objection to Report and Recommendation
132
03/28/2019
Report and Recommendation - Final
133
04/10/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
04/15/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
135
05/06/2019
Notice (Other)
136
05/06/2019
Objection to Report and Recommendations
137
05/13/2019
Notice (Other)
138
05/13/2019
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.