USA v. Donn et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2009-cr-00024 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
452
06/04/2018
Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
453
06/08/2018
Order on Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
06/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
455
06/13/2018
Summons Returned Executed
456
06/19/2018
Appear
06/19/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/29/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/29/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
459
06/29/2018
Unopposed Motion
06/29/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
461
07/06/2018
Warrant Returned Unexecuted
07/06/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
463
07/06/2018
Notice (Other)
464
07/06/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
465
07/06/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
466
07/17/2018
Warrant Returned Unexecuted
09/10/2018
Clerks Notice (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
471
09/11/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
09/12/2018
Clerks Notice (Text entry; no document attached.)
472
09/12/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.