USA v. Donn et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2009-cr-00024-12772 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
452
06/04/2018
Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
453
06/08/2018
Order on Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
06/08/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
455
06/13/2018
Summons Returned Executed
456
06/19/2018
Appear
06/19/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/29/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/29/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
459
06/29/2018
Unopposed Motion
06/29/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
461
07/06/2018
Warrant Returned Unexecuted
07/06/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
463
07/06/2018
Notice (Other)
464
07/06/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
465
07/06/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
466
07/17/2018
Warrant Returned Unexecuted
09/10/2018
Clerks Notice (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
471
09/11/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
09/12/2018
Clerks Notice (Text entry; no document attached.)
472
09/12/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
11/02/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/20/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
479
12/27/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
480
12/27/2018
Notice (Other)
481
12/27/2018
Order of Detention
482
12/28/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
483
01/09/2019
Unopposed Motion
01/10/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
485
01/11/2019
Notice (Other)
486
01/13/2019
Violation Disposition Report
487
01/14/2019
Notice (Other)
488
01/14/2019
Memorandum
01/16/2019
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
490
03/01/2019
Judgment on Revocation
491
03/01/2019
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf
492
04/30/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
05/18/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.