USA v. Dorn
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cr-00001 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
21
05/25/2018
Continue
05/29/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
09/24/2018
Waiver of Indictment
09/24/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
10/05/2018
Judgment
29
10/05/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.