USA v. Douglas
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00154 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
33
07/10/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
34
07/10/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
35
07/11/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
36
07/11/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
07/12/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
07/11/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
41
07/23/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
42
07/30/2018
Judgment
43
07/30/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.