USA v. Drury
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2017-cr-00006-57686 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
37
06/26/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
06/27/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
06/29/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
40
06/29/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
07/06/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
07/13/2018
Judgment
44
07/13/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
45
11/20/2018
Notice (Other)
46
11/28/2018
Amended Judgment
47
11/28/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.