USA v. Dubois
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2014-cr-00081-51271 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
46
10/23/2018
USPO Request for Modification - 12B
47
10/23/2018
Order
48
01/05/2019
Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
49
01/07/2019
Order on Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
01/07/2019
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned -JDR Retired (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
01/09/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
53
01/11/2019
Summons Returned Executed
01/16/2019
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2019
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
01/16/2019
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
56
01/16/2019
Notice (Other)
57
01/16/2019
Order Setting Conditions of Release
01/24/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
60
03/28/2019
Unopposed Motion
03/28/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
62
04/11/2019
Violation Disposition Report
04/12/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
65
05/01/2019
Judgment on Revocation
66
05/01/2019
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.