USA v. Ducasse
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00017 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
77
10/03/2018
Vacate (2255)
10/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
79
10/16/2018
Order
10/16/2018
Docket Annotation re Amended 2255 (Text entry; no document attached.)
80
10/19/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
81
11/01/2018
Notice (Other)
82
11/08/2018
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
83
11/08/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
84
11/27/2018
Transcript
85
11/27/2018
Transcript
86
12/06/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
87
12/11/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
88
12/13/2018
Discovery
89
12/13/2018
Affidavit

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.