USA v. Duenas et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00079 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
155
05/30/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
156
05/30/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
157
06/01/2018
Continue
158
06/04/2018
Response in Support
06/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/05/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
161
07/03/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
162
07/03/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
163
07/03/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
08/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
167
08/07/2018
Return of Property/PostTrial
08/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
169
08/20/2018
Response in Opposition
170
08/20/2018
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
172
08/20/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
173
08/21/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
08/21/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Evidentiary Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
177
08/24/2018
Sentencing
08/24/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
179
08/24/2018
Additional Related Document
180
08/27/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
181
09/03/2018
Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
182
09/04/2018
Judgment
183
09/04/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
184
09/04/2018
USCA Case Number
185
09/04/2018
USCA Time Schedule Order
09/11/2018
Judgment (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/12/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.