USA v. Eaklor et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00037-59513 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
62
02/28/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
64
03/21/2019
Continue
65
03/21/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
03/21/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
74
04/22/2019
Unopposed Motion
04/22/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/22/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/22/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/22/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
76
04/25/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
05/01/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/24/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/24/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.