USA v. Edwards
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2008-cr-00092-8910 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
71
11/15/2018
PFD Writ Returned
72
11/29/2018
Returned/Undeliverable Mail
73
03/15/2019
Release of Funds
74
03/18/2019
Order on Motion for Release of Funds
75
04/01/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
76
04/03/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
77
04/04/2019
Response in Opposition
78
04/04/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
79
04/09/2019
Notice of Change of Address
80
04/16/2019
Returned/Undeliverable Mail
81
04/17/2019
Response in Opposition
82
04/17/2019
Reply to Response
04/22/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
84
04/24/2019
Appoint Counsel
85
05/01/2019
Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
86
05/03/2019
USCA Case Number
87
05/03/2019
USCA Time Schedule Order
88
05/09/2019
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
89
05/13/2019
Returned/Undeliverable Mail

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.