USA v. Eklund
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00035-59521 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
26
05/21/2018
Notice (Other)
27
05/22/2018
Notice (Other)
28
05/29/2018
Notice (Other)
29
05/29/2018
Notice (Other)
06/05/2018
Notice (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
06/13/2018
Notice (Other)
34
06/13/2018
Notice (Other)
35
06/14/2018
Competency Hearing
36
06/14/2018
Notice (Other)
37
06/14/2018
Errata
38
06/19/2018
Order
06/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
06/21/2018
Notice (Other)
41
06/21/2018
Errata
09/24/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
12/06/2018
Notice (Other)
44
12/10/2018
Disqualify Judge
45
12/14/2018
Order
46
12/18/2018
Leave to File Document
12/20/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/26/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
12/27/2018
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
50
12/28/2018
Leave to File Document
12/31/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
12/31/2018
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
53
01/02/2019
Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge
01/03/2019
Order of Recusal (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
01/11/2019
Status Report
57
01/15/2019
Status Report
01/17/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/17/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
01/17/2019
Psychiatric Report
01/18/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
60
01/17/2019
Continue
62
01/22/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
63
01/31/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
02/01/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
64
01/31/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
67
02/06/2019
Psychiatric Report
68
02/11/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
69
02/14/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
70
02/15/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
71
03/01/2019
Notice of Change of Address
03/29/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/29/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
77
04/03/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
78
04/08/2019
Notice (Other)
04/09/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/09/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
Attorney Appointment Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
81
04/10/2019
Supplement
82
04/16/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
04/16/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/16/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/16/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
84
04/17/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
85
05/07/2019
Response in Opposition

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.