USA v. Eloi et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00135-60991 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
44
01/29/2019
Withdraw as Attorney
01/29/2019
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
02/22/2019
Unopposed Motion
48
02/22/2019
Continue
02/25/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
02/26/2019
Joinder to Motion
02/26/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/26/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/26/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/28/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/28/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/28/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/28/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
04/26/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
04/26/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/26/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/30/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/30/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/07/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/07/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/07/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/07/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.