USA v. Elze et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00110-60796 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
60
02/04/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
02/11/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/11/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/11/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
65
03/27/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
66
03/27/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
67
04/02/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
68
04/02/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
69
04/03/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
70
04/03/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
72
04/09/2019
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
04/10/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/11/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
76
04/17/2019
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
77
04/18/2019
Judgment
78
04/18/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.