USA v. Elze et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00110-60797 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/21/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
09/21/2018
Indictment - For Public
3
09/21/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
4
09/21/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
09/21/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
10/10/2018
Pretrial Services Report
7
10/10/2018
Arraignment
8
10/10/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
9
10/10/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
10
10/10/2018
Order of Detention
10/19/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
10/25/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
14
10/25/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
10/25/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
10/26/2018
Pretrial Services Report
10/31/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
10/31/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
20
10/31/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
21
10/31/2018
Order of Detention
22
10/31/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
23
10/31/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
10/31/2018
Docket Annotation re Duplicate Filing (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
10/31/2018
Protective Order
25
11/05/2018
Protective Order
26
11/06/2018
Order on Motion for Protective Order
27
11/13/2018
Order on Motion for Protective Order
28
11/15/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
29
11/15/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
30
11/15/2018
Indictment - For Public
31
11/16/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
11/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
11/19/2018
Notice (Other)
35
11/19/2018
Response in Opposition
11/21/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
11/28/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
11/28/2018
Attorney Appointment Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
11/28/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
11/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/29/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
12/02/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
12/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/06/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
12/11/2018
Plea Agreement
49
12/11/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
12/17/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/17/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/17/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/17/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
53
12/19/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
54
12/19/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
55
12/21/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
56
12/31/2018
Plea Agreement
57
12/31/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
01/04/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/11/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/11/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/11/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
63
03/18/2019
Unopposed Motion
03/19/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/19/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
71
04/09/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
79
05/01/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
80
05/02/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
05/06/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/06/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/06/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
82
05/22/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
83
05/22/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
84
05/22/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
85
05/22/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.