USA v. Erisman
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2019-cr-00003-61418 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/15/2019
Information - Felony
03/15/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/15/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
03/21/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
4
03/22/2019
Plea Agreement
5
03/22/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
03/22/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/22/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/25/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/25/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
03/22/2019
Unopposed Motion
10
04/09/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
04/09/2019
Docket Annotation re Wrong Event Selected (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
05/23/2019
Pretrial Services Report

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.