USA v. Esaw
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2004-cr-00120 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
73
07/31/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
07/31/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
75
07/31/2018
Order of Detention
76
08/01/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
77
08/02/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
08/02/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
79
08/03/2018
Order of Detention
80
08/06/2018
Order
10/09/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.